Sahlas, Demetrios Demos James (CPSO#: 76855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46373
Fax: (905) 577-8036
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chiavaras Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sahlas ( CPSO# 76855 )
Dr. M. Chiavaras ( CPSO# 78170 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
DBAC McMaster University
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Business Address:
Wentworth Halton X-ray and Ultrasound
105 - 1 Younge Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEMETRIOS DEMOS JAMES SAHLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHLAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2001