Sahni, Mohit (CPSO#: 88134)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Mar 2008 to 30 Apr 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009