Sahota, Sapanpreet Kaur (CPSO#: 108054)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2015 to 10 Jan 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 18 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2017