Sahsi, Navpreet Singh (CPSO#: 87916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Navpreet Sahsi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sahsi ( CPSO# 87916 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6001

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVPREET SINGH SAHSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 17 Dec 2007 to 13 Jan 2008
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2014