Sahu, Krishna Mohan (CPSO#: 77233)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:L.N. Mithila University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003