Saibil, Fredric Gordon (CPSO#: 24710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite H 52
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4727
Fax: (416) 480-5977
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Mar 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDRIC GORDON SAIBIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAIBIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1972