Said, Ibrahim (CPSO#: 76845)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 14 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: Abu-Shahwan, Ibrahim (used until: 15 Oct 2008 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hebrew, Italian

Education:Universita di Verona, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010