Saidi, Kevan (CPSO#: 79298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
2120 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 522-9101 Ext. 8
Fax: (705) 585-4869
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saidi Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Saidi ( CPSO# 79298 )
Dr. S. Smith ( CPSO# 79204 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
Suite 2
2120 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 522-9101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVAN SAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAIDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008