Saini, Manju (CPSO#: 108718)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2016

Expiry Date:  01 Feb 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Apr 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Guy's Hospital Medical School, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
All About Health
Unit E
1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 1P3
Phone: 9058840666
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jul 2016 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Feb 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Manju  Saini  may  practise  family  medicine at All About Health in
                  Richmond  Hill,  Ontario,  while  under  supervision   coordinated  by  a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires three  years  from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor  notifies  the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Saini's knowledge, skill, judgment  or  attitude,  does not provide
                        the  required  reports  to the College by the due date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Saini's practice.
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on April 14, 2016 and currently has an interim
                  expiry date of February 1, 2019.  The expiry date of this certificate may
                  be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.