Saini, Preeti (CPSO#: 69987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: Ralhan, Preeti (used until: 07 Sep 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Medical Centre
6633 Highway 7
Suite 214
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Fax: (905) 294-0029
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Preeti Saini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Saini ( CPSO# 69987 )

Business Address:
Markham Medical Centre
6633 Highway 7
Suite 214
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 294-2290

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PREETI SAINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1998