Saito, Aya (CPSO#: 86075)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Yokohama City University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Apr 2007 to 23 Jun 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2009