Sajo, Iidiko Mary (CPSO#: 31168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woburn Medical Dental Centre
4129 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Phone: (416) 439-1991
Fax: (416) 439-3593
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IIDIKO MARY SAJO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAJO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Jan 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1982