Sakhuja, Kanika (CPSO#: 108261)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Nov 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Dec 2015 to 17 Jan 2016
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

McMaster University, 26 Sep 2016 to 18 Dec 2016
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

McMaster University, 13 Mar 2017 to 09 Apr 2017
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2017 to 20 Nov 2017
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

McMaster University, 19 Dec 2017 to 14 Jan 2018
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2017