Sakinofsky, Isaac (CPSO#: 41264)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Records, CAMH, 250 College Street, Toronto ON M5T 1R8
Date Received: 27 Mar 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Mar 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Feb 2018