Sakoor, Ahmed (CPSO#: 22473)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 2, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Ahmed Sakoor to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 2, 2015:

Dr. Sakoor has ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.