Sakotic, George (CPSO#: 70396)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Fax: (416) 756-6203
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Cumberland Clinic
The Renaissance Court
Suite 225
162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 925-0113
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Dr Rice Cosmetic Clinic
Suite 345
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 391-4048
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE SAKOTIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAKOTIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001