Salach-Markiewicz, Krystyna (CPSO#: 54593)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Russian

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 8 Stoneham Rd Toronto, ON M9C 4Y8
Date Received: 09 May 2017


Address: Trillium Hospital 100 Queensway West Mississauga, Ontario L5B 1B8 Or Unit 311 77 Queensway West Mississauga, Ontario L5B 1B7
Instructions: Dr. Salach-Markiewicz`s medical record requests can be sent in the attention of Dr. Salach-Markiewicz to either address.
Date Received: 21 May 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017