Salako, Dokun Matin (CPSO#: 111006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Lagos, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr D M Salako Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Salako ( CPSO# 111006)

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
200 - 1164 Devonshire Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 6X7
Phone Number: (705) 474-5885

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOKUN MATIN SALAKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAKO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017