Salama, Said Salama Sargious (CPSO#: 25402)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Said Salama Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: CPM Pain Management 123 Edward Street Toronto, ON M5G 1E2
Date Received: 08 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014