Saleem, Azra Khurram (CPSO#: 53414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
678 Colborne street
London ON  N6A 3Z3
Phone: (519) 660-1141
Fax: (226) 663-0352
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

14 Nanette Drive
London ON  N5X 3L7
Canada
Phone: (519) 660-1141
Fax: (226) 663-0352
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZRA KHURRAM SALEEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEEM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998