Saleem, Tariq (CPSO#: 23977)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Salim, Tariq (used until: 14 Nov 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009