Saleh, Khaled Jamal (CPSO#: 63748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
311 Mack Ave
Detroit Medical Centre
Detroit Michigan, 48201
Detroit MI  48201
United States
Phone: (313) 745 1060

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALED JAMAL SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992