Saleh, Mark (CPSO#: 68322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Washington Township Medical
Foundation
Suite 335
39141 Civic Center Drive
Fremont CA  94538
United States
Phone: (510) 248-1414
Fax: (510) 797-5850

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999