Saleh, Mohamed Hamed Hussein (CPSO#: 108010)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Sep 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Sep 2016