Salehi, Fateme (CPSO#: 97852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3672
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATEME SALEHI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SALEHI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. SALEHI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SALEHI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SALEHI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SALEHI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SALEHI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 May 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 02 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 31 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 31 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 May 2018