Salehi Omran, Ahmad (CPSO#: 67488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Oct 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Apr 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2000
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Jun 2000
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 30 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 30, 2015, the following Undertaking, Acknowledgement and Consent
            by Dr. Ahmad Salehi Omran is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the
            certificate of registration held by Dr. Salehi Omran:

                              UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of

                                    DR. AHMAD SALEHI OMRAN
                                          ("Dr. Salehi Omran")
                  
                                                to
                  
                              COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
            ________________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Salehi Omran, certificate of registration number 67488, am a
                  member of the College. The College has inquired into my compliance with
                  the requirement to participate in a program of continuing professional
                  development.    

            (2)   I, Dr. Salehi Omran, am currently not practicing medicine in Ontario.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Salehi Omran, undertake to the College that, effective
                  immediately, I will not practise medicine in Ontario until each and every
                  one of the following conditions have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (4)   I, Dr. Salehi Omran, acknowledge that I do not have an active Ontario
                  Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP") billing number and I further acknowledge
                  that I have never had an active OHIP billing number. 


            (5)   I, Dr. Salehi Omran, undertake to the College to abide by the terms of
                  the College's Policy on Practice Management Considerations for Physicians
                  Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their
                  Practice Due to Relocation, a copy of which is attached hereto as
                  Appendix "A".  I also undertake to abide by the College's Policy on
                  Physicians Re-entering Practice, a copy of which is attached hereto as
                  Appendix "B". 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (6)   I, Dr. Salehi Omran, acknowledge that in exchange for this Undertaking,
                  the College has agreed to take no further action in relation to my
                  failure to participate in a program of continuing professional
                  development.

            (7)   I, Dr. Salehi Omran, acknowledge and agree that in considering my request
                  to return to practice, the Registrar may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Salehi Omran, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Salehi Omran, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of
                  this Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee or Fitness to Practise Committee of the College.

            (10)  I, Dr. Salehi Omran, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and
                  understand the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that
                  I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Salehi Omran, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code,
                  which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O.
                  1991, c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Salehi Omran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may
                  have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.