Salehian, Omid (CPSO#: 71400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Rm 418, McMaster Wing
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73822
Fax: (905) 577-8249
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. O. Salehian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Salehian ( CPSO# 71400 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Rm 418, McMaster Building
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMID SALEHIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEHIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2001