Salem, Eman Gaber (CPSO#: 61980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
windsor regional hospital -oullette
Department of Anaesthesia
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMAN GABER SALEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 May 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 May 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013