Salem, Khaled Yousef Salah El-Din (CPSO#: 73023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Sylvan St
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-9861 Ext. 2243
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khal Salem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2010

Medical Records Location

Address:  Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Attention Dr Alfi Beshay 165 Plymouth Road Welland, Ontario
Date Received: 27 Jan 2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALED YOUSEF SALAH EL-DIN SALEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Aug 1999
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2017