Salib, Michel George (CPSO#: 51558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shouldice Hospital
7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 4A3
Phone: (416) 994-3600
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHEL GEORGE SALIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011