Salib, Shadwa Shawky Eskander (CPSO#: 84872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
britteny glen medical center
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M6
Phone: (905) 8589393
Fax: (905) 8588960
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Living arts medical
unit 2, 4100 living arts drive
mississauga
L5B 0C3
Mississauga ON  L5B 0C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 270-5600
Fax: (905) 270-8830
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHADWA SHAWKY ESKANDER SALIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008