Salkauskis, Stanley John (CPSO#: 22873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 121
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone: (905) 303-1080
Fax: (888) 683-7326
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salkauskis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Salkauskis ( CPSO# 22873 )

Business Address:
Suite 121
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (905) 303-1080

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 948-1811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANLEY JOHN SALKAUSKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALKAUSKIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1970