Sallam, Hend Ali S (CPSO#: 104611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  20 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 25 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN -Toronto General Hospital
Division of Critical Care Medicine
N C S B 11 1141
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4746
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEND ALI S SALLAM shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SALLAM is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. SALLAM shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SALLAM is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SALLAM shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SALLAM is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SALLAM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 20 Mar 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PEAP - Resident - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2014 to 06 Sep 2014
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 24 Mar 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Mar 2018