Sallam, Sallam Abdel Muti Ahmed Mustafa (CPSO#: 85747)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Jordan, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2009