Salle, Joao Luiz Pippi (CPSO#: 68709)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Rio Grande Sul, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 02 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 May 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Apr 2014