Sallout, Ayah Ibrahim Ali (CPSO#: 78640)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2002 to 22 Oct 2003
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004