Salman, Michael Sabah (CPSO#: 72819)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004