Salo, Paul Timothy (CPSO#: 51656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3330 Hospital Drive Northwest
Calgary AB  T2N 4N1
Phone: (416) 220-2159
Fax: (403) 270-0617

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL TIMOTHY SALO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988