Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Salo, Rosaline (CPSO#: 33265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital
90 John Street South
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y8
Phone: (519) 272-8236
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosaline Salo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 21 2014


Corporation Name: Rosaline Salo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Salo ( CPSO# 33265 )

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
90 John Street South
Stratford ON  N2A 2Y8
Phone Number: (519) 272-8236

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSALINE SALO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1982