Saloojee, Navaaz Ahmed (CPSO#: 67042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 76420
Fax: (613) 737-8599
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Saloojee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Saloojee ( CPSO# 67042 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVAAZ AHMED SALOOJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALOOJEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 1997 to 22 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 22 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 22 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2000 to 22 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2001 to 22 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995