Salsberg, Barry Bernard (CPSO#: 26198)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barry Salsberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 25 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jan 2011