Salsberg, Michael Paul (CPSO#: 29169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2727 Yonge Street
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M4N 3R6
Phone: (416) 669-5226
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 10 Feb 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 10 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 10, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Michael Paul
            Salsberg, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Salsberg
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")    

                                                of
                  
                              DR. MICHAEL PAUL SALSBERG
                                          ("Dr. Salsberg")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Salsberg, certificate of registration number 29169, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my capacity
                  to practise medicine. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Salsberg, entered into undertakings with the College on January
                  12, 2011,  July 14, 2014 and March 4, 2015 whereby I, inter alia,
                  voluntarily resigned prescribing privileges and ceased to engage in
                  practice as a primary care physician or hospitalist as of January 12,
                  2011 (my "Previous Undertakings"). 

            (4)   I, Dr. Salsberg, entered into an undertaking on February 10, 2017
                  replacing and superseding my Previous Undertakings where I was able to
                  resume practice as a primary care physician subject to conditions (my
                  "February 10, 2017 Undertaking").

            (5)   I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the present Undertaking replaces and
                  supersedes my February 10, 2017 Undertaking. 


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (6)   I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that I have been abiding by the provisions
                  of this Undertaking since February 10, 2017 (the "Effective Date") and I
                  undertake to continue to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (7)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Salsberg, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        primary care clinical supervisor acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor") for a minimum of eight (8) months, as
                        outlined in the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking attached hereto
                        as Appendix "A", the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached
                        hereto as Appendix "B", and as set out below: 
                  
                        (i)   High Level Supervision
                  
                              1.    I, Dr. Salsberg, undertake that I will initially
                                    practise under the high level supervision of the
                                    Clinical Supervisor ("High Level Supervision") for at
                                    least two (2) months; 
                  
                              2.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will be the most responsible physician (MRP)
                                    for all patients during the period of High Level
                                    Supervision;
                  
                              3.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will be present on site for regular
                                    observation and discussion during the period of High
                                    Level Supervision;
                  
                              4.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will meet with me weekly to review all
                                    patient charts and discuss any concerns arising from
                                    the chart reviews during the period of High Level
                                    Supervision;
                  
                              5.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will make recommendations to me for practice
                                    improvements and ongoing professional development and
                                    inquire into my compliance with the recommendations
                                    during the period of High Level Supervision; 
                  
                              6.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will perform any other duties, such as
                                    reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with
                                    staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems
                                    necessary to my Clinical Supervision, during the period
                                    of High Level Supervision; 
                  
                              7.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will submit written reports to the College
                                    at least once every month, or more frequently if the
                                    Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of
                                    practice or compliance with the terms of this
                                    Undertaking during the period of High Level
                                    Supervision; and
                  
                              8.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will keep a log of all patient charts
                                    reviewed along with patient identifiers during the
                                    period of High Level Supervision. 
                  
                  (ii)  Moderate Level Supervision
                  
                              1.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that if, after a minimum
                                    of two (2) months of High Level Supervision, my
                                    Clinical Supervisor reports to the College that
                                    satisfactory progress has been made during the period
                                    of High Level Supervision and recommends the level of
                                    supervision be reduced, and if the College approves,
                                    the level of supervision will be reduced to a moderate
                                    level ("Moderate Level Supervision");
                  
                              2.    I, Dr. Salsberg, undertake that I will practise under
                                    Moderate Level Supervision for at least three (3)
                                    months; 
                  
                              3.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will be available on site to assist with
                                    patient management decisions during the period of
                                    Moderate Level Supervision;
                  
                              4.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will meet with me bi-weekly to review a
                                    minimum of twenty (20) patient charts and discuss any
                                    concerns arising from the chart reviews during the
                                    period of Moderate Level Supervision;
                  
                              5.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will make recommendations to me for practice
                                    improvements and ongoing professional development and
                                    inquire into my compliance with the recommendations
                                    during the period of Moderate Level Supervision; 
                  
                              6.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will perform any other duties, such as
                                    reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with
                                    staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems
                                    necessary to my Clinical Supervision, during the period
                                    of Moderate Level Supervision; 
                  
                              7.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will submit written reports to the College
                                    at least once every month, or more frequently if the
                                    Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of
                                    practice or compliance with the terms of this
                                    Undertaking during the period of Moderate Level
                                    Supervision; and
                  
                              8.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will keep a log of all patient charts
                                    reviewed along with patient identifiers during the
                                    period of Moderate Level Supervision. 
                  
                  (iii) Low Level Supervision
                  
                              1.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that if, after a minimum
                                    of three (3) months of Moderate Level Supervision, my
                                    Clinical Supervisor reports to the College that
                                    satisfactory progress has been made during the period
                                    of Moderate Level Supervision and recommends the level
                                    of supervision be reduced, and if the College approves,
                                    the level of supervision will be reduced to a low level
                                    ("Low Level Supervision");
                  
                              2.    I, Dr. Salsberg, undertake that I will practise under
                                    the Low Level Supervision for at least three (3)
                                    months; 
                  
                              3.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will be available for consultation within a
                                    reasonable period of time to assist with patient
                                    management decisions during the period of Low Level
                                    Supervision;
                  
                              4.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will meet with me monthly to review a
                                    minimum of twenty (20) patient charts and discuss any
                                    concerns arising from the chart reviews during the
                                    period of Low Level Supervision;
                  
                              5.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will make recommendations to me for practice
                                    improvements and ongoing professional development and
                                    inquire into my compliance with the recommendations
                                    during the period of Low Level Supervision; 
                  
                              6.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will perform any other duties, such as
                                    reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with
                                    staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems
                                    necessary to my Clinical Supervision, during the period
                                    of Low Level Supervision; 
                  
                              7.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will submit written reports to the College
                                    at least once every three months, or more frequently if
                                    the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard
                                    of practice or compliance with the terms of this
                                    Undertaking during the period of Low Level Supervision;
                                    and
                  
                              8.    I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the Clinical
                                    Supervisor will keep a log of all patient charts
                                    reviewed along with patient identifiers during the
                                    period of Low Level Supervision. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that Clinical Supervision shall cease
                        only upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and the
                        approval of the College. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking
                        and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Salsberg, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Salsberg, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the Effective date.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Salsberg, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Salsberg, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising primary care medicine until such
                        time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the
                        College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Salsberg, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the Public
                        Register.
                  
                  (i)   I Dr. Salsberg, agree that if I am required to cease practice
                        primary care as a result of section (6)(g) above, the entirety of
                        my scope of practice will be limited to only the following:
                  
                        1.    teaching naturopathic students, medical students and/or
                              residents;
                  
                        2.    reviewing laboratory results for laboratory testing requested
                              by naturopaths;
                  
                        3.    other laboratory work; and
                  
                        4.    acting as the physician on duty during stress testing
                              undertaken by a technician at the North York General Hospital
                              or another hospital or laboratory where the scope of that
                              role is set out at Appendix "I" to this Undertaking.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Salsberg, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education") as a component of the Clinical
                        Supervision:
                  
                        (i)   Review and discuss the following with my Clinical Supervisor: 
                  
                              1.    CPSO Medical Records Policy #4-12; 
                              2.    The Ontario Anti?infective Guidelines for Community
                                    acquired infections;
                              3.    Choose Wisely Canada's recommendations for primary care
                                    physicians;
                              4.    Canadian Guidelines for Safe and Effective Use of
                                    Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain; 
                              5.    Cancer Care Ontario's guidelines for screening and
                                    diagnosis of cancer relevant to primary care
                                    physicians; 
                              6.    The Society of Obstetricians and Gynecologists of
                                    Canada Clinical Practice Guidelines relevant to primary
                                    care physicians' management of women's health issues; 
                              7.    The Canadian Task Force on Preventive Health Care
                                    Periodic Health Exam Guidelines; 
                              8.    The Canadian Thoracic Society Asthma Guidelines on the
                                    diagnosis and management of asthma in preschoolers,
                                    children and adults;
                              9.    The Canadian Cardiovascular Society Atrial Fibrillation
                                    Guidelines;
                              10.   The Canadian Thoracic Society
                                    Chronic-Obstructive-Pulmonary-Disease clinical practice
                                    guidelines;
                              11.   The Canadian Diabetes Association Clinical Practice
                                    Guidelines relevant to primary care physicians; 
                              12.   Hypertension Canada's guidelines on diagnosis and
                                    management of hypertension;
                              13.   Osteoporosis Canada's 2010 Guidelines;
                              14.   Province of Ontario Publicly Funded Immunization
                                    Schedules; and
                  
                        (ii)  Any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Salsberg, undertake to complete this requirement before the
                        end of eight (8) months of the Clinical Supervision set out in
                        section 6 above.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Salsberg, undertake that, after at least eight (8) months of
                        the Clinical Supervision set out in section 6 above and Appendix
                        "A" attached, and after the Clinical Supervisor submits at least
                        one (1) written report to the College after at least three (3)
                        months of Low Level Supervision set out in section 6(a)(iii) above,
                        I will submit to a Reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment")
                        by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the
                        "Assessor").  I acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may
                        include a chart review, direct observation of my care, interviews
                        with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any
                        other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Salsberg, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to
                        abide by those recommendations of the Assessor that are approved by
                        the ICR Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may
                        discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (10)  Resignation of Prescribing Privileges   

                  (a)   I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that I have executed the Voluntary
                        Resignation of Prescribing Privileges Form, which is attached
                        hereto as Appendix "C" (the "Resignation") and forms part of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Salsberg, undertake and agree that I will not issue new
                        prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the
                        following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under
                              the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); or
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19)
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Appendix "D"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Appendix "E")
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Appendix "F");                       
                  
                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
            (11)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Salsberg, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of the Effective Date.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Salsberg, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Salsberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "G" and Appendix "H",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (15)  I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (17)  I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (18)  I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that this Undertaking shall be posted on the
                  Public Register during the time period that the Undertaking remains in
                  effect.

            (19)  I, Dr. Salsberg, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on
                  the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains
                  in effect: 

                        Dr. Salsberg entered into undertakings with the College whereby he
                        voluntarily ceased to engage in practice as a primary care
                        physician or hospitalist as of January 12, 2011.
                  
                        Dr. Salsberg may now resume practice as a primary care physician or
                        hospitalist subject to the following conditions: 
                  
                        -     Dr. Salsberg will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of eight
                              months. 
                        -     Dr. Salsberg will engage in professional education in primary
                              care medicine.
                        -     Dr. Salsberg's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College after a minimum of eight months of
                              Clinical Supervision.
                  
                        Dr. Salsberg voluntarily relinquished his prescribing privileges as
                        of January 12, 2011 with respect to the following drugs, substances
                        and preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as
                        amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                        In addition, Dr. Salsberg has voluntarily relinquished his
                        prescribing privileges with respect to the following drugs,
                        substances and preparations set out in the corresponding
                        regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized as
                        follows:
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);        
                  
                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (20)  I, Dr. Salsberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  set out in section (7) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (21)  I, Dr. Salsberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (22)  I, Dr. Salsberg, give my irrevocable consent to any person who
                  facilitates my completion of the Professional Education set out in
                  section (7) above, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education set out in section (7) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 10, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary given by Dr. Michael Paul effective February 10, 2017:

Dr. Salsberg entered into undertakings with the College whereby he voluntarily ceased to engage in practice as a primary care physician or hospitalist as of January 12, 2011.

Dr. Salsberg may now resume practice as a primary care physician or hospitalist subject to the following conditions:

• Dr. Salsberg will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a minimum of eight months.
• Dr. Salsberg will engage in professional education in primary care medicine.
• Dr. Salsberg’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College after a minimum of eight months of Clinical Supervision.

Dr. Salsberg voluntarily relinquished his prescribing privileges as of January 12, 2011 with respect to the following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

In addition, Dr. Salsberg has voluntarily relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to the following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.