Salter, Jennifer Elaine (CPSO#: 87444)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2007 to 22 Aug 2007
Elective Trainee - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011