Salter, Margaret Jane (CPSO#: 52377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 St Clair Ave East
Suite 200
Toronto ON  M4T 1M9
Phone: (416) 788-5263
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Greg Ryan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salter ( CPSO# 52377 )
Dr. G. Ryan ( CPSO# 53249 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue
OPG 3-906
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8415

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET JANE SALTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1988