Salter, Robert Ian (CPSO#: 33133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Ian Salter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Salter ( CPSO# 33133 )

Business Address:
510 - 330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Business Address:
301 - 1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 926-0932

Business Address:
200 - 236 Wellington Avenue East
Aurora ON  L4G 1J5

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 1B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
920 - 305 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 3V4
Phone Number: (416) 321-3883

Business Address:
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 946-0222

Business Address:
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-1700

Business Address:
400 - 9251 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9T3
Phone Number: (905) 889-8006

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT IAN SALTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1982