Saltstone, Scot Paul (CPSO#: 67808)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Campus Health Centre
100 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 8K9
Phone: (705) 494-3050 Ext. 6343
Fax: (705) 495-7909
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mental Health Clinic
North Bay ON  P1B 5Z7
Canada
Phone: 705-494-3050
Fax: 705-494-3092
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Powassan and Area Medical Centre
8 King Street East
Powassan ON  P0H 1Z0
Canada
Phone: (705) 724-1020
Fax: (705) 724-5499
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08

Nipissing University, Canadore Coll
Campus Health Centre
100 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 8K9
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-7600 Ext. 5228
Fax: (705) 495-7909
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saltstone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saltstone ( CPSO# 67808 )

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
120 King Street West
North Bay ON  P1B 5Z7
Phone Number: (705) 494-3050

Business Address:
8 King Street East
Powassan ON  P0H 1Z0
Phone Number: (705) 724-3388

Business Address:
100 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 8K9
Phone Number: (705) 474-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOT PAUL SALTSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALTSTONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996