Salvador, Jillian Marie (CPSO#: 92832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12-1300 Garth Street
Hamilton, ON
Hamilton ON  L9C4L7
Phone: (905) 575-0611
Fax: 905-575-7737
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILLIAN MARIE SALVADOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALVADOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 13 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 30 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 11 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2016