Salvadori, Marina Ines (CPSO#: 68488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Western Ont
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marina Salvadori Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salvadori ( CPSO# 68488 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARINA INES SALVADORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALVADORI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 1994 to 26 Aug 1994
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 02 Sep 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 03 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1996