Salvaterra, Rosana Pellizzari (CPSO#: 58032)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Names: Pellizzari, Rosana (used until: 02 Nov 2015 )     Pellizzari, Rosanne (used until: 21 Jun 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough County-City Hlth Unit
Jackson Square
185 King Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2R8
Phone: (705) 743-1000 Ext. 264
Fax: (705) 743-1810
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSANA PELLIZZARI SALVATERRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALVATERRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1989