Salyani, Mohamed Asif (CPSO#: 77980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16945 Leslie Street
Unit 44
Newmarket ON  L3Y 9A2
Phone: (905) 235-8055
Fax: (855) 203-1060
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 230
1101 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Canada
Phone: (289) 624-1789
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Unit 410
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Richmond Hill ON  L6A 4P9
Canada
Phone: (289) 963-1717
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asif Salyani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Salyani ( CPSO# 77980 )

Business Address:
16945 Leslie Street
Unit 44
Newmarket ON  L3Y 9A2
Phone Number: (905) 235-8055

Business Address:
230 - 1101 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 235-8055

Business Address:
410 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 235-8055

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED ASIF SALYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALYANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1903 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2009